Global patent index - EP 1090982 A1

EP 1090982 A1 2001-04-11 - Tablet with improved water solubility

Title (en)

Tablet with improved water solubility

Title (de)

Formkörper mit verbesserter Wasserlöslichkeit

Title (fr)

Article moulé ayant une solubilité dans l'eau améliorée

Publication

EP 1090982 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120215 A

Priority

EP 99120215 A

Abstract (en)

Shaped article with improved water solubility contains anionic, cationic, amphoteric and/or nonionic surfactant, disintegrating agent and defoamer granulate comprising silicones and carriers.

Abstract (de)

Vorgeschlagen werden Formkörper mit verbesserter Wasserlöslichkeit, enthaltend (a) anionische, nichtionische, kationische und/oder amphotere Tenside, (b) Sprengmittel und (c) Entschäumergranulate, enthaltend Silicone und Trägermaterialien.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 3/22; C11D 3/37

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/225 (2013.01); C11D 3/0026 (2013.01); C11D 3/222 (2013.01); C11D 3/373 (2013.01); C11D 17/0073 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1090982 A1 20010411

INPADOC legal status

2007-02-07 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20061005

2005-06-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS IP MANAGEMENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050210

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991009

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI