Global Patent Index - EP 1091010 A1

EP 1091010 A1 2001-04-11 - Low-alloy heat-resistant steel, process for producing the same, and turbine rotor

Title (en)

Low-alloy heat-resistant steel, process for producing the same, and turbine rotor

Title (de)

Niedrig legierter Stahl, Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung und Turbinenrotor

Title (fr)

Acier faiblement allié, sa méthode de fabrication et rotor de turbine

Publication

EP 1091010 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00308591 A

Priority

JP 28355199 A

Abstract (en)

In the field of CrMoV heat-resistant alloys for use in turbine rotors, in order to provide a low-alloy steel which has a toughness at the same level as conventional materials and has excellent high-temperature strength properties, particularly inhibition of creep embrittlement, and in order to provide a process for producing such a low-alloy steel and a turbine rotor in which such a low-alloy steel is used, trace impurities of phosphorus, sulfur, copper, aluminum, arsenic, tin, and antimony in a CrMoV heat-resistant alloy are reduced to specific levels or lower. In addition, trace impurities such as cobalt, niobium, tantalum, nitrogen, and boron are added to increase the creep strength according to a test using an unnotched test piece. In addition, according to the production process, quenching is carried out after heating to 1000 DEG C or higher so as to inhibit precipitation of pro-eutectoid ferrite phase.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/12; C21D 6/00; C22C 38/10; C22C 38/18; C22C 38/22; C22C 38/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/42 (2006.01); C22C 38/44 (2006.01); C22C 38/46 (2006.01); C22C 38/52 (2006.01); C22C 38/60 (2006.01); C21D 1/18 (2006.01); C21D 9/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/46 (2013.01); C22C 38/008 (2013.01); C22C 38/42 (2013.01); C22C 38/44 (2013.01); C22C 38/52 (2013.01); C22C 38/60 (2013.01); C21D 1/18 (2013.01); C21D 9/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091010 A1 20010411; EP 1091010 B1 20031022; AT 252652 T 20031115; AT 283381 T 20041215; DE 60006051 D1 20031127; DE 60006051 T2 20040722; DE 60016286 D1 20041230; DE 60016286 T2 20051208; EP 1275745 A1 20030115; EP 1275745 B1 20041124

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070929

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070929

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070929

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070929

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-09-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060927

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-09-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060922

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-09-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060913

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-09-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060908

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-07-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60006051 P 20031127

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2003-10-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011129

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001018

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI