Global Patent Index - EP 1091022 A2

EP 1091022 A2 2001-04-11 - Metal strip pickling apparatus

Title (en)

Metal strip pickling apparatus

Title (de)

Beizanlage für Metallbänder

Title (fr)

Appareil de décapage de bandes métalliques

Publication

EP 1091022 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00120430 A

Priority

DE 19947857 A

Abstract (en)

Pickling device comprises a flow pickling chamber with an inlet opening and a run-off opening and guides and transporting devices for the strip (9) and outlet openings for applying pickling agents to the strip. The outlet openings are formed as flat nozzles in plates (10, 11) of distribution boxes (14-17) which are distributed on zones in the cross and longitudinal direction of the strip. The pickling agent can be adjusted from zone to zone via a supply of distribution boxes. Preferred Features: The back walls lying opposite the plates of the boxes are formed of a lid (2) and the base (1a) of the chamber housing.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Beizanlage für Metallbänder (9) mit einer Durchlaufbeizkammer, in der das zu behandelnde Band (9) flächendeckend von oberhalb und unterhalb des Bandes (9) angeordneten Flächendüsen (12,13) mit Beizmittel beaufschlagt wird. Die Flächendüsen (12,13) sind in einzelne Zonen aufgeteilt, wobei das den Flächendüsen (12,13) der einzelnen Zonen zuzuführende Beizmittel von Zone zu Zone einstellbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23G 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23G 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23G 3/023 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091022 A2 20010411; EP 1091022 A3 20020626; DE 19947857 A1 20010503

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030711

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030225

2003-03-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP STAHL AG

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI