Global Patent Index - EP 1091031 A2

EP 1091031 A2 2001-04-11 - Mechanism for actuating the sley and the belts of grippers in a weaving loom

Title (en)

Mechanism for actuating the sley and the belts of grippers in a weaving loom

Title (de)

Mechanismus zur Betätigung der Weblade und der Greiferbänder in eine Webmaschine

Title (fr)

Mécanisme pour la commande du battant et des rubans à griffes dans un métier à tisser

Publication

EP 1091031 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00120738 A

Priority

IT MI991976 A

Abstract (en)

In a mechanism for actuating the sley (7) and the belts (N) of grippers (Z) in weaving looms, the continuous rotary movement of the main axis (A) of the loom is transferred, by means of an angular transmission comprising a bevel gear pair (2), to a secondary shaft (1) which is perpendicular thereto. A pair of conjugate radial cams (3) is keyed onto the secondary shaft (1) and causes, by means of an associated rocker arm (9), the movement of the gear wheel (D) driving the belts (N) of the grippers (Z). A spherical cam (4) is also axially mounted on the free end of said secondary shaft (1), said cam actuating a rocker arm (6), the fulcrum of which is directly connected to the shaft of the sley (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/27; D03D 49/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/27 (2006.01); D03D 49/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/275 (2013.01); D03D 47/272 (2013.01); D03D 49/60 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091031 A2 20010411; EP 1091031 A3 20030903; IT 1313377 B1 20020723; IT MI991976 A1 20010323; IT MI991976 D0 19990923

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040304

2004-07-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI