Global Patent Index - EP 1091032 A2

EP 1091032 A2 2001-04-11 - A let-off control device for a weaving machine

Title (en)

A let-off control device for a weaving machine

Title (de)

Ablass-Steuervorrichtung für Webmaschinen

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de contrôle du déroulement pour métier à tisser

Publication

EP 1091032 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00120680 A

Priority

JP 28743299 A

Abstract (en)

A let-off control device for a weaving machine comprises a basic speed calculator (11), an average tension calculator (18), controller (14) and a control amplifier (17) to drive a let-off motor (M). The controller (14) operates in synchronism with an operating cycle determined by a clock signal (Sc), independently of operating cycle of the average tension calculator (18), with no likelihood that substantial control parameters will fluctuate due to variations in the operation speed of the weaving machine. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 49/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 49/10 (2006.01); D03D 49/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 49/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091032 A2 20010411; EP 1091032 A3 20031001; JP 2001115364 A 20010424; JP 3542748 B2 20040714

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040402

2004-07-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-06-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI