Global Patent Index - EP 1091034 A2

EP 1091034 A2 2001-04-11 - Method and device for self-learning the position of electromechanical actuators, particularly for circular textile machines and the like

Title (en)

Method and device for self-learning the position of electromechanical actuators, particularly for circular textile machines and the like

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Selbstlernen der Position von elektromechanischen Stellgliedern, insbesonderes für Rundstrickmaschinen und dergleichen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour l'autoaprentissage de la position d'actionneurs électromécaniques, notamment pour métiers à tricoter circulaires et similaire

Publication

EP 1091034 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00121244 A

Priority

IT MI992100 A

Abstract (en)

A method for self-learning the position of electromechanical actuators, particularly for circular textile machines provided with a needle cylinder with multiple circumferentially arranged actuators for actuating heels of flexible elements arranged at each needle of the needle cylinder, each one of the actuators being provided with a plurality of levers which are actuated electronically, each one of the levers being suitable to pass from an inactive position to a position for engagement with a corresponding heel of the needle cylinder, consisting in: sending a command to each one of the actuators in order to arrange all of the levers except one in the inactive position, inducing a contact between the lower lever and the heel of a flexible element, to generate an electrical signal; starting the rotation of the needle cylinder; measuring, by way of signals generated by an encoder which is rigidly coupled to the needle cylinder, and electrical signals generated by the contact between the lower lever of each actuator and a corresponding heel, the angle between the zero position of the encoder and each heel that makes contact with the corresponding lever. The device includes the actuators (1), supported on an insulating element, and arranged around the needle cylinder (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 15/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/66 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091034 A2 20010411; EP 1091034 A3 20020306; IT 1314032 B1 20021203; IT MI992100 A1 20010409; IT MI992100 D0 19991007

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-05 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-11-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-10-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI