Global Patent Index - EP 1091035 A1

EP 1091035 A1 2001-04-11 - Hydroentangled nonwoven, method for its manufacture and its use

Title (en)

Hydroentangled nonwoven, method for its manufacture and its use

Title (de)

Hydrodynamisch verfestigter Vliesstoff, Verfahren zur Herstellung und Anwendung davon

Title (fr)

Non-tissé aiguilleté par voie hydraulique, procédé d'obtention et son utilisation

Publication

EP 1091035 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00660175 A

Priority

FI 19992142 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention refers to a hydroentangled nonwoven comprising polyolefin fibers or multicomponent fibers comprising at least one polyolefin. The invention is characterized in that liquid absorption and drying properties has been improved by microcreping the nonwoven. The invention refers also to a method for manufacturing such a product as well as to the use of such a product in a wiping article. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 1/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/4291 (2012.01); D04H 1/492 (2012.01); D04H 1/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/492 (2013.01); D04H 1/4291 (2013.01); D04H 1/74 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091035 A1 20010411; FI 19992142 A 20010406

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080814

2008-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080403

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI