Global Patent Index - EP 1091036 A2

EP 1091036 A2 2001-04-11 - Carpet underfelt

Title (en)

Carpet underfelt

Title (de)

Teppichunterfilz

Title (fr)

Thibaude

Publication

EP 1091036 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00203152 A

Priority

GB 9921675 A

Abstract (en)

A method of treating an underfelt comprising felted thermoplastic fibres which comprises heating at least one surface of the felt sufficiently to soften the fibres, and then passing the felt through polished callender rollers whereby to callender and quench the softened thermoplastic surface of the felt to give a glazed finish. Preferably, the rollers are polished stainless steel rollers, which conveniently may be water cooled to give the best effect. Advantageously, to give optimum heat transfer, the felt is passed around about 90 DEG of the surface of the roller The nip of the rollers is used to give control over the initial pressure and final thickness of the felt, whereas the increased angle of wrap increases the heat transfer and quenching and thus the glazing effect on the softened thermoplastic fibre surface. The underfelts treated in accordance with the invention are particularly useful in two distinct areas. Firstly, if the surface is lightly glazed, achieved by modest application of heat before callendering, the felt, when in place on the floor, allows a carpet to move more easily when being fitted In a second application, where more heat and pressure is applied, the surface can be callendered further until it is highly glazed and is almost impervious. This enables the finished carpet underlay to be stuck to the floor and for the carpet to be stuck to the underlay.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06C 15/02; D06N 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06C 15/02 (2006.01); D06N 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06N 7/0089 (2013.01); D06C 15/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091036 A2 20010411; EP 1091036 A3 20021113; GB 9921675 D0 19991117

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-09-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI