Global Patent Index - EP 1091047 A2

EP 1091047 A2 2001-04-11 - Device and method for excavating deep trenches

Title (en)

Device and method for excavating deep trenches

Title (de)

Vorrichtung sowie verfahren zum ausheben von tiefgräben

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour creuser des tranchées profondes

Publication

EP 1091047 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00307606 A

Priority

GB 9923634 A

Abstract (en)

The invention is embodied in a device, and method for excavating an underdrainage (a subterainian drain) which is capable of preserving surface vegetation such as grass in pasture in good condition and providing excellent drainage. The device 20 forms an underdrainage in the ground while being hauled by a tractor 10. The underdrainage excavating device has a discard device 40 for discarding the dirt excavated by an endless belt of excavating buckets 25 to scatter the dirt over an extended area of the ground such that the grass and pastures will not be buried and wither. Part of the dirt covers a slit space S such that any dirt entry from outside into the slit space S is prevented. The excavating device 20 also forms an underdrainage by following an inclined plane signal which projects an inclined plane at an angle to a reference horizontal plane such that said underdrainage slopes to provide excellent gravity drainage performance. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02B 11/02 (2006.01); E02F 5/10 (2006.01); E02F 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 5/06 (2013.01); E02F 5/145 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DK FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091047 A2 20010411; EP 1091047 A3 20020130; EP 1091047 B1 20050330; GB 0324884 D0 20031126; GB 2355031 A 20010411; GB 2355031 B 20040407; GB 2391032 A 20040128; GB 2391032 B 20040331; GB 9923634 D0 19991208; JP 2001107346 A 20010417; JP 4615688 B2 20110119

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050630

2006-03-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060102

2005-06-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-05-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-03-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DK FI SE

2005-03-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050330

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030128

2002-11-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DK FI SE

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 02F 5/10 A, 7E 02F 5/14 B, 7E 02F 5/02 B, 7E 02F 3/84 B

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DK FI SE

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI