Global Patent Index - EP 1091054 A1

EP 1091054 A1 2001-04-11 - System to realize one and multistorey buildings with a composition of modular spatial units obtained from a casting of concrete in moduls according to fixed schemes

Title (en)

System to realize one and multistorey buildings with a composition of modular spatial units obtained from a casting of concrete in moduls according to fixed schemes

Title (de)

System um Gebäude mit einem oder mehreren Stockwerken, zusammengesetzt aus modulierten, räumlichen Einheiten aus in vorbereiteten Formen nach festgesetzten Plänen gegossenem Beton, zu bauen

Title (fr)

Système pour réaliser des bâtiments d'un ou de plusieurs étages composé d'unités spatiales modulaires obtenues par coulage de béton dans des coffrages préparés selon des règles déterminées

Publication

EP 1091054 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00830645 A

Priority

IT AR990020 A

Abstract (en)

This system is for use in industrialized building and permits constructing at very reasonable prices.It is based on the repetition according to the project , of a basic cell constructed on site with appropriate muolds which leave an empty space in the concrete slabs where prefabricated slabs are inserted . It satisfactorily resolves technical problems because of the modularity and stability of the mould elements , the ensuing modularity of the basic cells,the thickness of the concrete slabs is very reasonable in respect of the distance of the bearing walls and for its versatility as it can be used for many different types of projects, fig. 3 - 4 - 5 - 6 - 7. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/348

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/348 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/34823 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091054 A1 20010411; IT 1309727 B1 20020130; IT AR990020 A1 20010409; IT AR990020 D0 19991008

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-10 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20070707

2006-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050503

2005-06-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050503

2002-03-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010912

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI