Global Patent Index - EP 1091056 A2

EP 1091056 A2 2001-04-11 - Flat covering element for the covering of a building's roof

Title (en)

Flat covering element for the covering of a building's roof

Title (de)

Flächiges Abdeckelement zum Abdecken des Daches eines Gebäudes

Title (fr)

Elément de couverture plat pour le recouvrement de la toiture d'un bâtiment

Publication

EP 1091056 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00120992 A

Priority

  • DE 19948282 A
  • DE 10018566 A

Abstract (en)

The element (13) for covering the roof of a building is constituted as a compound body with two or more layers, and includes a thermal insulation layer (14) facing the underside (11) and a weatherproof cover layer facing the topside (12).

Abstract (de)

Bei dieser Erfindung handelt es sich um ein flächiges Abdeckelement zum Abdecken eines Daches eines Gebäudes, umfassend eine dem Gebäude zugewandte Unterseite (11) und eine dem Gebäude abgewandte Oberseite (12), wobei das Abdeckelement (13) als zwei- oder mehrlagiger Verbundkörper ausgebildet ist und eine der Unterseite (11) zugewandte Wärmedämmschicht (14) sowie eine der Oberseite zugewandte witterungsbeständige Abdeckschicht (15) flächig aufeinanderliegend umfaßt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 3/35; E04D 3/36; E04D 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 3/35 (2006.01); E04D 3/36 (2006.01); E04D 13/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/1681 (2013.01); E04D 3/351 (2013.01); E04D 3/358 (2013.01); E04D 3/3608 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091056 A2 20010411; EP 1091056 A3 20010523

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011124

2002-03-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI