Global patent index - EP 1091058 A1

EP 1091058 A1 2001-04-11 - Cylinder lock body

Title (en)

Cylinder lock body

Title (de)

Schliesszylinderstator

Title (fr)

Stator d'une serrure cylindrique

Publication

EP 1091058 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830595 A

Priority

EP 99830595 A

Abstract (en)

A cylinder lock body comprises two cylindrical half-housings (2, 3) with two respective half-flanges (7, 8) connected by a bridge-like portion (9) in which a hole (10) is formed for a cylinder lock fixing screw. On one face of one of the two half-flanges (7, 8) and on the opposite face of the other half-flange there are secured two reinforcing elements (11, 12) which have a portion (11a, 12a) surrounding the hole (10) for the fixing screw. Each reinforcing element extends only on one of the two half-flanges, so that in case of flexural rupture of the lock body at the bridge-like portion (9), the two half-housings (2, 3) cannot be fully separated from each other, since the respective reinforcing elements (11, 12) freely rotatably engage the fixing screw with their highlet-shaped ends (11a, 12a) . <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/048 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 29619634 U1 19980326 - WILKA SCHLIESTECHNIK GMBH [DE]

Citation (search report)

[DA] DE 29619634 U1 19980326 - WILKA SCHLIESTECHNIK GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091058 A1 20010411; EP 1091058 B1 20011128; CN 1288997 A 20010328; CN 1332112 C 20070815; DE 69900510 D1 20020110; DE 69900510 T2 20020508; ES 2166215 T3 20020401; TR 200002726 A1 20010420

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150922

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130923

2015-04-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150429

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140908

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140530

2014-06-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69900510

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130923

2014-04-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121004

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120926

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120919

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120911

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-06 [REG ES GC2A] EXPLOITATION CERTIFICATE REGISTERED APPLICATION WITH SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: GC2A

- Effective date: 20120725

2012-07-20 [REG ES GC2A] EXPLOITATION CERTIFICATE REGISTERED APPLICATION WITH SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: GC2A

- Effective date: 20120710

2012-06-28 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 69900510

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120503

2003-07-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2002-11-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2166215

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69900510

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-10

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR IT SE

2001-12-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE

2001-11-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010514

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000404

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI