Global Patent Index - EP 1091061 A2

EP 1091061 A2 2001-04-11 - Device for assisted opening of door locks

Title (en)

Device for assisted opening of door locks

Title (de)

Öffnungshilfe für Türschlösser

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'assistance à l'ouverture des serrures de porte

Publication

EP 1091061 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00120626 A

Priority

DE 19948052 A

Abstract (en)

The lock has a spring bolt (12), a detent pawl (18) and a motor-driven carrier bolt, which releases the detent pawl from the spring bolt when it is activated and runs against an abutment (50), which holds the detent pawl in its blocking position. The abutment is arranged at a block lever (48) separated from the detent pawl, which is carried from the detent pawl between the locked and unlocked positions.

Abstract (de)

Ein Türschloß (10) mit Öffnungshilfe (26) verfügt über eine drehbare Schloßfalle (12), eine diese in der Raststellung arretierende Sperrklinke (18) und einen angetriebenen Mitnehmerbolzen (44), der die Sperrklinke (18) öffnet und an einem Anschlag (50) blockierbar ist. Die bisher übliche Lösung, den Anschlag (50) an der Sperrklinke (18) vorzusehen, schränkt die konstruktive Gestaltung ein. Um weitergehenden Spielraum bei der Anordnung der Teile zu bekommen, wird vorgeschlagen, den Anschlag (50) an einem separaten Blockhebel (48) anzuordnen, der von der Sperrklinke (18) beim Öffnen in seine Blockierstellung mitnehmbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/14 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/14 (2013.01); Y10S 292/23 (2013.01); Y10S 292/42 (2013.01); Y10S 292/43 (2013.01); Y10T 292/1047 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1082 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19505779 A1 19960829 - BOCKLENBERG & MOTTE BOMORO [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091061 A2 20010411; EP 1091061 A3 20021030; DE 19948052 A1 20010412; US 6390517 B1 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040820

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021118

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI