Global patent index - EP 1091063 A2

EP 1091063 A2 2001-04-11 - Ball lock for use in anti-shoplifting tags

Title (en)

Ball lock for use in anti-shoplifting tags

Title (de)

Kugelschloss für Antidiebstahletikette

Title (fr)

Serrure à billes pour etiquette antivol

Publication

EP 1091063 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00203503 A

Priority

NL 1013251 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a ball lock, for instance for use in anti-shoplifting labels, which ball lock is uncoupled from the protective needle (9) by applying a composite magnetic field produced by two or more magnets(10) which, in a specific position and polarization, must be brought near the wafer, so as to exert a force perpendicular to an uncoupling part (3). When a magnetic field is applied at the wafer, produced by one or more magnets (10) which have not been properly placed or polarized, the ball lock will not uncouple the protective needle (9), because the uncoupling part (3) is then drawn askew. In this ball lock the wafer need not be placed so as to be directed to this composite magnetic field of two or more magnets, because the uncoupling part (3) in the wafer can rotate such that the metal parts or the magnets (10) fastened thereon come to lie precisely opposite the proper magnets (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 73/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 73/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 73/0017 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091063 A2 20010411; EP 1091063 A3 20010418; NL 1013251 C2 20010410

INPADOC legal status

2002-08-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011019

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI