Global Patent Index - EP 1091065 A2

EP 1091065 A2 2001-04-11 - Locking element for a lock-fitting of a movable door- or window-wing

Title (en)

Locking element for a lock-fitting of a movable door- or window-wing

Title (de)

Schliesseinrichtung für einen Beschlag zur Verriegelung eines beweglichen Rahmenteils eines Fensters oder einer Tür

Title (fr)

Elément de verrouillage pour une ferrure de verrouillage d'un vantail mobile d'une fenêtre ou d'une porte

Publication

EP 1091065 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00121749 A

Priority

DE 19948862 A

Abstract (en)

The lock unit is arranged in the moving frame part and has a locking pin (28), which is coupled to a locking or drive rod and is guided in a frame groove. The lock unit is inserted separately and directly from outside into the frame groove of the frame part or a frame beam of the frame part. The lock unit is preferably inserted in the frame groove perpendicularly and from above. An Independent claim is included for a lock including the bolt lock unit.

Abstract (de)

Eine Schließeinrichtung für einen Beschlag ­ insbesondere einen Riegelstangenbeschlag - zur Verriegelung eines beweglichen Rahmenteils eines Fensters oder einer Tür an einem festen Rahmenteil, wobei die Schließeinrichtung in dem beweglichen Rahmenteil angeordnet ist und einen Verriegelungszapfen aufweist, der mit einer Riegel- oder Treibstange gekoppelt und mit dieser am beweglichen Rahmenteil in einer Rahmennut verschiebbar geführt ist, zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß die Schließeinrichtung (18) separat direkt von außen in die Rahmennut (24) des beweglichen Rahmenteils oder eines einzelnen Rahmenholmes für das bewegliche Rahmenteil einsetzbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/18; E05C 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/18 (2006.01); E05C 9/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/185 (2013.01); E05C 9/22 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3545861 A1 19870702 - SCHUERMANN & CO HEINZ [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091065 A2 20010411; EP 1091065 A3 20030409; DE 19948862 A1 20010412

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20110503

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031219

2004-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Country Code:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

LT

- Payment date: 20001009

2004-01-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Country Code:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

LV

- Payment date: 20001009

2003-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 05C 9/18 A

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 05C 9/22 B

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 05C 9/20 B

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT PAYMENT 20001009;LV PAYMENT 20001009;MK;RO;SI