Global Patent Index - EP 1091066 A2

EP 1091066 A2 2001-04-11 - Hinge for doors or windows

Title (en)

Hinge for doors or windows

Title (de)

Drehband für Türen oder Fenster

Title (fr)

Charnière pour portes ou fenêtres

Publication

EP 1091066 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104918 A

Priority

DE 19947670 A

Abstract (en)

The hinge band has casement band for a casement, which is connected by a joint axle (11a) at a frame band (12). A side adjustment unit for horizontal casement adjustment and a height adjustment unit for vertical casement adjustment are integrated in the casement band. The height and side adjustment units are integrated into the casement band as a common unit. The height and side adjustment units are preferably integrated by a cross slide, which is adjustable horizontally by a first slide plate and vertically by a second slide plate.

Abstract (de)

Drehband für Türen oder Fenster, mit einem an einem Flügel anzuschlagenden Flügelband, das mit einer Gelenkachse (11a) an einem an einem Blendrahmen zu befestigenden Rahmenband (12a) angelenkt ist, mit einer in das Flügelband integrierten, horizontale Flügelverstellungen gestattenden Seitenverstelleinrichtung, und mit einer vertikale Flügelverstellungen gestattenden Höhenverstelleinrichtung. Um die Justiermöglichkeiten des Flügels zu verbessern, wird das Drehband so ausgebildet, daß die Höhenverstelleinrichtung gemeinsam mit der Seitenverstelleinrichtung in das Flügelband integriert ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/12 (2006.01); E05D 7/04 (2006.01); E05D 7/10 (2006.01); E05D 11/00 (2006.01); E05D 7/00 (2006.01); E05D 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/128 (2013.01); E05D 7/0423 (2013.01); E05D 7/1005 (2013.01); E05D 7/1044 (2013.01); E05D 11/0054 (2013.01); E05D 5/14 (2013.01); E05D 5/16 (2013.01); E05D 7/02 (2013.01); E05D 11/0018 (2013.01); E05D 2003/025 (2013.01); E05D 2005/102 (2013.01); E05D 2007/1027 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/00 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/26 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091067 A1 20010411; EP 1091067 B1 20041229; AT 300650 T 20050815; AT 513968 T 20110715; DE 19947670 A1 20010809; DE 19947670 B4 20061026; DE 50009090 D1 20050203; DE 50010818 D1 20050901; DK 1091066 T3 20051024; EP 1091066 A2 20010411; EP 1091066 A3 20010801; EP 1091066 B1 20050727; EP 1437467 A2 20040714; EP 1437467 A3 20080730; EP 1437467 B1 20110622; PL 200031 B1 20081128; PL 342800 A1 20010409

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160405

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-08-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROTO GLUSKE-BKV GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HANS DIETER NIEMANN, 50169 KERPEN, DE

- Document: DE 50010818

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-08-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROTO GLUSKE-BKV GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: NIEMANN, HANS DIETER, 50169 KERPEN, DE

- Document: DE 50010818

- Effective date: 20110705

2009-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050727

2006-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-07-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-02-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-12-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051227

2005-10-27 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-10-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-10-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051003

2005-10-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-09-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010818 P 20050901

2005-08-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-07-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-07-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-07-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-07-27 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050727

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030702

2002-04-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011206

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05D 7/04 A, 7E 05D 7/10 B

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI