Global Patent Index - EP 1091067 A1

EP 1091067 A1 2001-04-11 - Hinge for doors or windows

Title (en)

Hinge for doors or windows

Title (de)

Drehband für Türen oder Fenster

Title (fr)

Charnière pour portes ou fenêtres

Publication

EP 1091067 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00121666 A

Priority

DE 19947670 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1091066A2] The hinge band has casement band for a casement, which is connected by a joint axle (11a) at a frame band (12). A side adjustment unit for horizontal casement adjustment and a height adjustment unit for vertical casement adjustment are integrated in the casement band. The height and side adjustment units are integrated into the casement band as a common unit. The height and side adjustment units are preferably integrated by a cross slide, which is adjustable horizontally by a first slide plate and vertically by a second slide plate.

Abstract (de)

Um ein Drehband für Türen oder Fenster, mit einem an einem Flügel anzuschlagenden Flügelband (10), das mit einer Gelenkachse an einem an einem Blendrahmen zu befestigenden Rahmenband angelenkt ist, mit einer in das Flügelband (10) integrierten, horizontale Flügelverstellungen gestattenden Seitenverstelleinrichtung, und mit einer vertikale Flügelverstellungen gestattenden Höhenverstelleinrichtung dahingehend zu verbessern, daß das Flügelband bei einer Justierung des Flügels dienenden Verstellvorgängen seine relative Stellung zum Rahmenband nicht verändert und eine sichere Halterung des Flügelbandes am Flügel gewährleistet bleibt, muß die Höhenverstelleinrichtung gemeinsam mit der Seitenverstelleinrichtung in das Flügelband (10) integriert sein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/12 (2006.01); E05D 7/04 (2006.01); E05D 7/10 (2006.01); E05D 11/00 (2006.01); E05D 7/00 (2006.01); E05D 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/128 (2013.01); E05D 7/0423 (2013.01); E05D 7/1005 (2013.01); E05D 7/1044 (2013.01); E05D 11/0054 (2013.01); E05D 5/14 (2013.01); E05D 5/16 (2013.01); E05D 7/02 (2013.01); E05D 11/0018 (2013.01); E05D 2003/025 (2013.01); E05D 2005/102 (2013.01); E05D 2007/1027 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/00 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/26 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091067 A1 20010411; EP 1091067 B1 20041229; AT 300650 T 20050815; AT 513968 T 20110715; DE 19947670 A1 20010809; DE 19947670 B4 20061026; DE 50009090 D1 20050203; DE 50010818 D1 20050901; DK 1091066 T3 20051024; EP 1091066 A2 20010411; EP 1091066 A3 20010801; EP 1091066 B1 20050727; EP 1437467 A2 20040714; EP 1437467 A3 20080730; EP 1437467 B1 20110622; PL 200031 B1 20081128; PL 342800 A1 20010409

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101004

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101004

2011-08-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50009090

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101004

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091230

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091110

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091022

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091023

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-03-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-02-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009090 P 20050203

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-12-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030620

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010929

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI