Global Patent Index - EP 1091070 A2

EP 1091070 A2 2001-04-11 - Hinge with at least two hinge parts relatively pivotable with respect to each other along a common pivot axis

Title (en)

Hinge with at least two hinge parts relatively pivotable with respect to each other along a common pivot axis

Title (de)

Scharnier mit wenigstens zwei relativ zueinander um eine gemeinsame Drehachse verdrehbaren Scharnierteilen

Title (fr)

Charnière avec au moins deux éléments relativement pivotants l'un par rapport à l'autre le long d'un axe commun de pivotement

Publication

EP 1091070 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00121556 A

Priority

DE 29917550 U

Abstract (en)

Hinge has parts that move relative to each other about a rotating axis. Fixing pins (7, 8) are provided on the hinge heads (5, 6) and have a smooth surface. The pins are inserted into bores in the door, window or door frame.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Scharnier mit wenigstens zwei relativ zueinander um eine gemeinsame Drehachse (2) verdrehbaren Scharnierteilen (3, 4) bestehen diese Scharnierteile (3, 4) aus Scharnierköpfen (5, 6) und an diesen angeordneten Befestigungszapfen (7, 8) zum Einsetzen in eine Tür oder ein Fenster und in einen Tür- oder Fensterrahmen. Die Scharnierteile (3, 4) sind gegeneinander federbelastet verdrehbar. Die an den Scharnierköpfen (5, 6) anschließenden Befestigungszapfen (7, 8) weisen eine im wesentlichen glatte Oberfläche auf zum axialen Einstecken in Bohrungen an der Tür, dem Fenster, dem Tür-rahmen oder dem Fensterrahmen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 1/1016 (2013.01); E05D 5/02 (2013.01); E05F 1/1215 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/622 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29917550 U1 20010215; EP 1091070 A2 20010411; EP 1091070 A3 20030702

INPADOC legal status


2010-05-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20091201

2008-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20080606

2004-03-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-24 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Country Code:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

RO

- Payment date: 20031211

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20031211

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-07-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 05F 1/12 A

2003-07-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 05D 5/02 B

2003-07-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 05D 7/04 B

2002-01-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SFS INTEC HOLDING AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI