Global Patent Index - EP 1091096 A1

EP 1091096 A1 2001-04-11 - System for detecting the rotation speed of an internal combustion engine camshaft

Title (en)

System for detecting the rotation speed of an internal combustion engine camshaft

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Drehzahlerfassung von einer Nockenwelle für Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de mesure de la vitesse de rotation d'un arbre à cames de moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1091096 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00121777 A

Priority

IT MI992090 A

Abstract (en)

A system (1) for detecting the rotation speed of an internal combustion engine camshaft (2), wherein a toothed timing pulley (4), fitted to the camshaft (2), carries integrally a sound wheel (10) facing a speed sensor (11) for detecting a signal generated by rotation of the sound wheel (10); according to the invention, as opposed to being a conventional toothed wheel, the sound wheel (10) is defined by a magnetic ring (13) made of a magnetized polymer material and carried by a rigid supporting ring (12) fitted integrally to the pulley (4), so as to obtain a stronger, more accurate, "cleaner" signal as compared with that of a conventional toothed sound wheel. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/46; F01L 1/053

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/053 (2006.01); F01L 1/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/053 (2013.01); F01L 1/46 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0321809 A1 19890628 - BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5549091 A 19960827 - TSUNODA MASAKI [JP], et al
  • [A] US 4517934 A 19850521 - PAPEZ STANISLAV [DE]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 03 31 March 1997 (1997-03-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 391 (M - 1298) 19 August 1992 (1992-08-19)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091096 A1 20010411; IT 1313774 B1 20020917; IT MI992090 A1 20010406; IT MI992090 D0 19991006

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041221

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010727

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI