Global patent index - EP 1091098 A1

EP 1091098 A1 2001-04-11 - Lubrication circuit for a working machine

Title (en)

Lubrication circuit for a working machine

Title (de)

Ölkreislauf für eine Arbeitsmaschine

Title (fr)

Circuit de lubrification pour une machine de travail

Publication

EP 1091098 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00119083 A

Priority

DE 19948658 A

Abstract (en)

The circuit incorporates an oil reservoir (14) and a feed pipe system. The reservoir is integrated in an insert (13a), which is positioned replaceable in a holder and forms part of the oil circuit. The insert is fitted through an opening, and this is closed after assembly. Insert and pipe system have connected oil connections (16). These contain valves (24), which are closed when the insert is separated from the circuit. The insert is located in the cylinder head of an IC engine.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Modul 13a für den Schmierölkreislauf einer Brennkraftmaschine oder anderen Arbeitsmaschine vorgeschlagen. Dieses weist zumindest einen Ölvorrat 14 auf, der mitsamt dem Einsatz 13a ausgewechselt werden kann. Ventile 24 verhindern dabei das Auslaufen des Einsatzes während des Auswechselns. Hierzu läßt sich ein zuverlässiger Ölwechsel bewerkstelligen. Das Modul kann mit weiteren Funktionselementen ausgestattet sein. Hier sind insbesondere ein Filterelement 23, eine Förderpumpe 26, eine zusätzliche Zentrifuge 29, ein Additivreservoir 31 und unterschiedliche Sensoren S1, S2 zu nennen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 11/03; F01M 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 1/12 (2006.01); F01M 1/02 (2006.01); F01M 11/03 (2006.01); F01M 11/04 (2006.01); F01M 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 11/04 (2013.01); F01M 11/03 (2013.01); F01M 2001/1071 (2013.01); F01M 2011/035 (2013.01); F01M 2011/0483 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091098 A1 20010411; DE 19948658 A1 20010412; JP 2001132424 A 20010515; US 6374797 B1 20020423

INPADOC legal status

2006-09-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060331

2004-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040910

2003-12-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANN + HUMMEL GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010511

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI