Global Patent Index - EP 1091116 A3

EP 1091116 A3 2001-12-19 - Fuel supply device and fuel pump

Title (en)

Fuel supply device and fuel pump

Title (de)

Kraftstoffversorgungseinrichtung sowie Kraftstoffpumpe

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'alimentation en carburant et pompe à carburant

Publication

EP 1091116 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00119705 A

Priority

DE 19948170 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1091116A2] The fuel pump (5) has an electronic control unit and at least one hydraulic control input (13). Also the hydraulic control input (13) of the fuel pump is connected at the fuel supply line and-or the fuel return line. The control of the fuel pump is combined together with this to form a structural unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 37/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60K 15/03 (2006.01); F02M 37/00 (2006.01); F02M 37/02 (2006.01); F02M 37/04 (2006.01); F02M 37/08 (2006.01); F02M 37/10 (2006.01); F02M 37/18 (2006.01); H02K 7/14 (2006.01); H02K 29/00 (2006.01); F02D 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/025 (2013.01); F02M 37/106 (2013.01); F02D 33/003 (2013.01); F02M 37/0052 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091116 A2 20010411; EP 1091116 A3 20011219; CA 2321606 A1 20010407; DE 19948170 A1 20010412; DE 19948170 B4 20050504; JP 2001173534 A 20010626

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040504

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI