Global Patent Index - EP 1091119 A2

EP 1091119 A2 2001-04-11 - Swash plate tyre pump

Title (en)

Swash plate tyre pump

Title (de)

Taumelscheibenpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à plateau en biais

Publication

EP 1091119 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00308801 A

Priority

GB 9923822 A

Abstract (en)

A pump comprises a shaft (4), two opposed swash plates (2,3) carried by the shaft (4), and at least one plunger (9, 10, 11, 12) disposed between the swash plates (2, 3). The swash plates (2, 3) are rotatable with the shaft (4) about a longitudinal axis of the shaft (4) for driving the or each plunger (9, 10, 11, 12), the arrangement being such that forces exerted on the swash plates (2, 3) by the or each plunger (9, 10, 11, 12) during operation of the pump are mutually opposed so as to reduce the net axial force on the shaft (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/14 (2006.01); F04B 1/16 (2006.01); F04B 1/29 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/146 (2013.01); F04B 1/16 (2013.01); F04B 1/295 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

GB 192342701 A

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091119 A2 20010411; EP 1091119 A3 20011212; GB 9923822 D0 19991208

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020613

2002-10-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04B 1/16 A, 7F 04B 1/14 B, 7F 04B 1/28 B

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI