Global Patent Index - EP 1091120 A2

EP 1091120 A2 2001-04-11 - Method for determining and controlling a pump parameter

Title (en)

Method for determining and controlling a pump parameter

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Ermitteln oder Steuern eines Betriebsparameters einer Pumpe

Title (fr)

Méthode pour déterminer et contrôler le paramètre d'une pompe

Publication

EP 1091120 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00121761 A

Priority

DE 19947890 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves feeding a pumped medium to the pump, which has at least one displacement element on a rotary shaft that pumps the medium into a vol. during a compression process. The position of a pressure extreme in the vol. is determined during the pumping process and a pump operating parameter is determined and/or controlled depending on the time and/or angular positions of the pressure extreme.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren zum Ermitteln oder Steuern eines Betriebsparameters einer Pumpe beschrieben, bei der die durch den Pumpvorgang der Pumpe erzeugten Druckspitzen in einem Kraftstoffspeicher gemessen werden und die Winkelposition der Druckspitze zum Ermitteln eines Betriebsparameters oder zum Steuern der Pumpe verwendet wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 11/00 (2006.01); F04B 49/06 (2006.01); F04B 49/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/065 (2013.01); F04B 11/005 (2013.01); F04B 49/225 (2013.01); F04B 2201/1208 (2013.01); F04B 2205/063 (2013.01); F04B 2205/13 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091120 A2 20010411; EP 1091120 A3 20020703; EP 1091120 B1 20050216; DE 19947890 A1 20010419; DE 19947890 B4 20051027

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071005

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051219

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-10-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051025

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-03-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009538 P 20050324

2005-03-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-03-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2005-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-02-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-03-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020603

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04B 11/00 A, 7F 04B 49/06 B, 7F 04B 49/22 B

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI