Global Patent Index - EP 1091121 A2

EP 1091121 A2 2001-04-11 - Film coated piston

Title (en)

Film coated piston

Title (de)

Filmbeschichteter Kolben

Title (fr)

Piston revêtu d'un film mince

Publication

EP 1091121 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00121768 A

Priority

JP 28563399 A

Abstract (en)

A coating film (C) is formed on the circumferential surface (22a) of a piston (20). When forming the film (C), film material (Z) is transferred onto only part of the circumferential surface (22a) by a transfer printing machine such as a screen printer (40) or a roll coater (50). Therefore, unlike spray coating, the piston (20) need not be masked, which facilitates the application of the film material (Z). Further, the film material (Z) is not wasted. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 27/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/00 (2006.01); B05C 1/08 (2006.01); B05C 1/16 (2006.01); F04B 27/08 (2006.01); B41M 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 1/0826 (2013.01); B05C 1/165 (2013.01); F04B 27/0878 (2013.01); B41M 3/006 (2013.01); F05C 2225/04 (2013.01); F05C 2253/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091121 A2 20010411; EP 1091121 A3 20011017; JP 2001107861 A 20010417

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030502

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001005

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI