Global Patent Index - EP 1091167 A2

EP 1091167 A2 2001-04-11 - Signalling device comprising LED-arrays

Title (en)

Signalling device comprising LED-arrays

Title (de)

Signalgeber mit LED-Reihen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de signalisation avec rangées de diodes électroluminescentes

Publication

EP 1091167 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890305 A

Priority

AT 171799 A

Abstract (en)

The optical system consists of an arrangement of LEDs, spaced apart from a plate (4) comprising a number of Fresnel lenses (5) with a focal length (F). A lamellar grating is arranged directly in front of the plate. A smooth-surfaced front plate (8) is attached. At least two LEDs (2) are arranged behind each lens (5) in a horizontal row. The light beams (6) from the LEDs are aligned as parallel as possible and produce a divergent beam in the horizontal direction, with main beam directions (12a,12b,12c) corresponding to the LED row arrangement (2a,2b,2c).

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Signalgeber in LED-Technik vorgestellt, welcher durch Kombination zweier bereits bekannter Bauweisen besondere Vorteile bezüglich Helligkeit, Lichtverteilung und visuellem Erscheinungsbild bietet. Auf einer Leiterplatte (1) sind LED (2) in Form von kurzen horizontalen Reihen (3) in einem Hexagonalraster angeordnet. Diesen ist eine transparente Kondensorplatte (4), auf welcher untereinander gleiche Kondensoren (5) in Fresnelbauweise lückenlos aneinandergrenzen, im Abstand der Brennweiten (F) vorzugsweise zentrisch vorgesetzt. Hierdurch werden die Lichtbündel (6) im Vertikalschniit des Aufrisses parallel ausgerichtet, in horizontaler Richtung ergibt sich eine Divergenz (D). Ein vorgelagertes Lamellengitter lässt das Nutzlicht in bekannter Weise weitgehend unbehindert durch und absorbiert auf seiner schwarzmatten Oberseite von schräg oben einfallendes Sonnenlicht. Die Optik wird vorne von einer Streuscheibe (8) mit bekannter Anordnung von Streuelementen (8a) zur Erzielung der vorgeschriebenen Lichtverteilung abgeschlossen. Hinten positioniert ein Gehäuse (9) Kondensorplatte (4) und Leiterplatte (1) zueinander. Es weist Durchbrüche (10) auf, durch welche die LED (2) ihr Licht senden. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 13/02; G08G 1/095

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/00 (2006.01); G08G 1/095 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/095 (2013.01); F21W 2111/02 (2013.01); F21Y 2115/10 (2016.08)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091167 A2 20010411; EP 1091167 A3 20060208; AT 410711 B 20030725; AT A171799 A 20021115

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060809

2006-11-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2006-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2006-02-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-02-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-08-24 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: SWARCO FUTURIT VERKEHRSSIGNALSYSTEME GES.M.B.H.

2005-07-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SWARCO FUTURIT VERKEHRSSIGNALSYSTEME GES.M.B.H.

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI