Global Patent Index - EP 1091174 A1

EP 1091174 A1 2001-04-11 - Method for characteristics adjustment of burners

Title (en)

Method for characteristics adjustment of burners

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Einstellung von Kennlinien von Brennern

Title (fr)

Méthode de réglage des caractéristiques de brûleurs

Publication

EP 1091174 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99119859 A

Priority

EP 99119859 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves varying the power of the burner (1) based on a first power value (P1), an air parameter (Aj), fuel parameter (Fj) and additional parameter (Hj). The change in power changes the air flow and/or fuel flow and/or auxiliary drive in a first direction (Rj) until the exhaust gas parameters change upon occurrence of the next power value (Pi+1). A least one next air parameter (Ai+1) and/or fuel parameter (Fi+1 are determined so that defined exhaust gas parameters can be set.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Einstellung von Kennlinien von Brennern, wobei ausgehend von einem bestimmten Leistungswert (Pi) mit mindestens einem zugeordneten Luftwert (Ai) und einem Brennstoffwert (Fi), die Leistung und somit der zugeordnete Luftdurchfluß und der zugeordnete Brennstoffdurchfluß und ggf. zugeordnete Hilfsantriebe in jeweils eine erste Richtung (Ri) derart verändert wird, daß sich die gemessenen Abgaswerte bei einem nächsten Leistungswert (Pi+1) verändern. Im Anschluß daran wird die Leistung und somit der Luftdurchfluß bzw. der Brennstoffdurchfluß und ggf. Hilfsantriebe derart verändert, daß sich nächste Luftwerte (Ai+1) und nächste Brennstoffwerte (Fi+1) bei diesem nächsten Leistungswert (Pi+1) derart ergeben, daß sich wieder die zuvor definierten Abgaswerte einstellen. Im Anschluß daran wird erneut der Luftdurchfluß und der Brennstoffdurchfluß verändert, jedoch in solche Richtungen, die die Ergebnisse dieser und mindestens einer vorherigen Abgasmessung berücksichtigen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 1/02; F23N 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 3/00 (2006.01); F23N 1/02 (2006.01); F23N 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/003 (2013.01); F23N 1/022 (2013.01); F23N 5/006 (2013.01); F23N 2027/20 (2013.01); F23N 2033/06 (2013.01); F23N 2035/06 (2013.01); F23N 2035/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091174 A1 20010411; CN 1291700 A 20010418; JP 2001141234 A 20010525; KR 20010050868 A 20010625

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-05 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20020928

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI