Global Patent Index - EP 1091183 A1

EP 1091183 A1 2001-04-11 - Apparatus for drying and cleaning small-sized material, in particular crushed plastic waste

Title (en)

Apparatus for drying and cleaning small-sized material, in particular crushed plastic waste

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Trocknen und Reinigen von kleinstückigem Gut, insbesondere von zerkleinerten Kunststoffabfällen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de séchage et de nettoyage de matière en petits morceaux, notamment de déchets fractionnés d'une matière plastique

Publication

EP 1091183 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00890295 A

Priority

AT 171499 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a fixed container (1), which forms an annular flow channel (7) for the waste between outer (8) and inner (9) sieve walls. At least one outlet (24) is connected to the external sieve wall. At least one fan (6) directs an air flow inside the flow channel, through the inner sieve wall and out of the container. A collection space (21) between the container wall (22) and the outer sieve wall is provided to separate the flow channel. The inner sieve wall is rotated in the sense of the air flow.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Vorrichtung zum Trocknen und Reinigen von kleinstückigem Gut, insbesondere von zerkleinerten Kunststoffabfällen, mit einem stehenden Behälter (1), der zwischen einem äußeren und einem inneren Siebmantel (8, 9) einen ringförmigen Strömungskanal (7) für das zu behandelnde Gut bildet und wenigstens einen an den äußeren Siebmantel (8) angeschlossenen Gutauslaß (24) aufweist, und mit wenigstens einem Gebläse (6) für eine innerhalb des Strömungskanales (7) umlaufende, über den inneren Siebmantel (9) aus dem Behälter (1) abführbare Luftströmung beschrieben, wobei zwischen dem Behältermantel (22) und dem äußeren Siebmantel (8) ein Sammelraum (21) für Abscheidungen aus dem Strömungskanal (7) vorgesehen sind. Um vorteilhafte Konstruktionsbedingungen zu schaffen, wird vorgeschlagen, daß der innere Siebmantel (9) drehbar gelagert und im Umlaufsinn der Luftströmung antreibbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 5/08; F26B 17/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 5/08 (2006.01); F26B 17/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 17/107 (2013.01); F26B 5/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091183 A1 20010411; EP 1091183 B1 20040901; AT 408525 B 20011227; AT A171499 A 20010515; DE 50007603 D1 20041007

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141003

2015-06-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 275259 T

- Effective date: 20141003

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20131017

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-08-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-10-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007603 P 20041007

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT

2004-09-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040901

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030826

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE IT

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010920

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI