Global Patent Index - EP 1091185 A2

EP 1091185 A2 2001-04-11 - Plate-like heat exchanger

Title (en)

Plate-like heat exchanger

Title (de)

Plattenwärmetauscher

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur à plaques

Publication

EP 1091185 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119864 A

Priority

DE 19948222 A

Abstract (en)

The heat exchanger has superimposed heat transfer plates (2), each having a herringbone pattern structure (10). Primary side flow channels for a first heat exchange medium, especially one to be evaporated, and a second heat exchange medium, especially a heat transfer medium, are arranged between the plates. The flow channels are formed between two adjacent heat transfer plates, whose structures at least partly mesh to reduce the spacing to a minimum.

Abstract (de)

Plattenwärmetauscher mit übereinander angeordneten, Strukturierungen (2a,2b) aufweisenden Wärmeübertragungsplatten (2), zwischen welchen primärseitige Strömungskanäle für ein erstes Wärmetauschermedium, insbesondere ein zu verdampfendes Medium, und sekundärseitige Strömungskanäle für ein zweites Wärmetauschermedium, insbesondere ein Wärmeträgermedium, ausgebildet sind, wobei die primärseitigen und/oder die sekundärseitigen Strömungskanäle jeweils zwischen zwei benachbarten Wärmeübertragungsplatten (2) ausgebildet sind, deren Strukturierungen (2a,2b) unter Beibehaltung eines minimalen Abstandes wenigstens teilweise ineinander greifen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 9/00; F28F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 9/00 (2006.01); F28F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 3/042 (2013.01); F28D 9/005 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0064 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49366 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9116589 A1 19911031 - ALFA LAVAL THERMAL [SE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091185 A2 20010411; EP 1091185 A3 20030604; DE 19948222 A1 20010419; DE 19948222 C2 20021107; US 6389696 B1 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031205

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-06-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BALLARD POWER SYSTEMS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI