Global Patent Index - EP 1091185 A3

EP 1091185 A3 2003-06-04 - Plate-like heat exchanger

Title (en)

Plate-like heat exchanger

Title (de)

Plattenwärmetauscher

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur à plaques

Publication

EP 1091185 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00119864 A

Priority

DE 19948222 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1091185A2] The heat exchanger has superimposed heat transfer plates (2), each having a herringbone pattern structure (10). Primary side flow channels for a first heat exchange medium, especially one to be evaporated, and a second heat exchange medium, especially a heat transfer medium, are arranged between the plates. The flow channels are formed between two adjacent heat transfer plates, whose structures at least partly mesh to reduce the spacing to a minimum.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 9/00; F28F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 9/00 (2006.01); F28F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 3/042 (2013.01); F28D 9/005 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0064 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49366 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091185 A2 20010411; EP 1091185 A3 20030604; DE 19948222 A1 20010419; DE 19948222 C2 20021107; US 6389696 B1 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031205

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-06-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BALLARD POWER SYSTEMS AG

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI