Global Patent Index - EP 1091194 A1

EP 1091194 A1 2001-04-11 - NORMAL OPERATION MONITORING DEVICE FOR DEVICE FOR DETECTING PHYSICAL FEATURES OF EGGS

Title (en)

NORMAL OPERATION MONITORING DEVICE FOR DEVICE FOR DETECTING PHYSICAL FEATURES OF EGGS

Title (de)

GERÄT ZUM ÜBERWACHEN DES NORMALTRIEBES EINER ANORDNUNG ZUM DETEKTIERUNG VONPHYSISCHEN MERKMAKER VON ELERN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CONTROLE DU FONCTIONNEMENT NORMAL D'UN APPAREIL SERVANT A DETECTER DES CARACTERISTIQUES PHYSIQUES D'OEUFS

Publication

EP 1091194 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00904038 A

Priority

  • JP 0000936 W
  • JP 15559099 A

Abstract (en)

A device for monitoring the normal operation of weighing instruments (X1, X2, and X3) for chicken eggs used in a weight grading apparatus A for chicken eggs has a judging device 12 for monitoring the normal and abnormal operation of the weighing instruments (X1, X2, and X3) depending on whether or not the weight detected by the weighing instruments (X1, X2, and X3) indicates a predetermined state, as well as a display 13 for outputting a result of judgement by the judging device 12. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01D 21/00; A01K 43/00; B07C 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 43/00 (2006.01); A01K 43/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01K 43/08 (2013.01); A01K 43/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091194 A1 20010411; EP 1091194 A4 20040915; US 6637599 B1 20031028; WO 0065312 A1 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060901

2004-09-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL

2001-07-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA NABERU

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001204

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE