Global patent index - EP 1091269 A1

EP 1091269 A1 2001-04-11 - Watch case

Title (en)

Watch case

Title (de)

Uhrengehäuse

Title (fr)

Boîte de montre

Publication

EP 1091269 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99119821 A

Priority

EP 99119821 A

Abstract (en)

The wristwatch has a body (10) with a wall (12) which encloses a cylindrical movement compartment (14). A ring (20) has an operating element (18) and is able to rotate in a groove (22) around the movement compartment wall (12) such that the operating element is either retracted (32) or able to operate the movement through a hole in the movement wall (12). The case is completed by bottom plates (34,36)

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une boîte de montre comportant : une carrure comportant un logement central destiné à recevoir un mouvement d'horlogerie et au moins une ouverture latérale ou radiale débouchant dans ledit logement, des moyens manoeuvrables depuis l'extérieur de la carrure pour effectuer, au travers de ladite ouverture, la commande dudit mouvement d'horlogerie, ladite boîte étant caractérisée en ce que la carrure est pourvue d'un coulisseau mobile et de moyens de guidage de ce coulisseau dans la carrure, en ce que ledit coulisseau porte lesdits moyens de commande, et en ce que dans au moins une première position déterminée du coulisseau lesdits moyens de commande peuvent agir sur le mouvement à travers ladite ouverture. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04G 1/00; G04B 3/04; G04C 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 3/04 (2006.01); G04C 3/00 (2006.01); G04G 21/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04G 21/00 (2013.01); G04B 3/045 (2013.01); G04C 3/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091269 A1 20010411

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080502

2008-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20080229

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011011

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI