Global Patent Index - EP 1091337 A2

EP 1091337 A2 2001-04-11 - Sheets with adhesive system for electronic printing

Title (en)

Sheets with adhesive system for electronic printing

Title (de)

Folien mit Aufklebesystem für elektronische Drücksysteme

Title (fr)

Feuilles avec système adhésif pour impression électronique

Publication

EP 1091337 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00500206 A

Priority

BR 7902580 U

Abstract (en)

Sheets with adhesive system for electronic printing comprising a card-like special paper sheet (1) with a smooth face and a siliconized back, where there is applied a support paper sheet (2) of which the contact face (3) is adhesive, having two adjacent longitudinal areas (4) and (5) delimited by half-cuts (6) and subdivided by transversal half-cuts (7), defining smaller areas which specify the visit cards (8) to be printed, having limited by half-cuts (11) areas (10) of the support paper which correspond to the areas (4) and (5), with smaller width than these, resulting in two thin side "strips" (12) superposed to the distal borders of the visit cards, having on the upper extremity of the areas (10) one "tab" (13) used to remove those areas of the support paper and consequently to release the visit cards after printing. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03B 27/58; B42D 15/02; G09F 3/02; G09F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 15/02 (2006.01); G09F 3/02 (2006.01); G09F 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 15/02 (2013.01); G09F 3/02 (2013.01); G09F 3/0288 (2013.01); G09F 3/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091337 A2 20010411; EP 1091337 A3 20031001; BR 7902580 U 20001003

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040402

2004-07-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-06-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 03B 27/58 A

2003-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 09F 3/02 B

2003-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 09F 3/10 B

2003-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 42D 15/02 B

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI