Global Patent Index - EP 1091361 A1

EP 1091361 A1 2001-04-11 - Filter and x-ray examination apparatus

Title (en)

Filter and x-ray examination apparatus

Title (de)

Filter und Röntgenstrahlungs-Prüfvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Filtre et dispositif d'examen par rayons-x

Publication

EP 1091361 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00203400 A

Priority

  • EP 00203400 A
  • EP 99203240 A

Abstract (en)

A filter which includes a stack of deformable foils which are locally attached to one another, and also includes comparatively rigid members which are situated to both sides of the stack of foils, extend parallel to the surface of the foils and each of which is attached to an outer surface of the stack of foils by way of a buffer member. The foils can be moved away from one another in a main direction by means of the rigid members, which main direction extends transversely of the surface, in order to form ducts between the foils. The buffer member is then contractible mainly in a direction which extends parallel to the surface and transversely of the ducts. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G21K 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G21K 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G21K 1/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091361 A1 20010411; EP 1091361 B1 20050209

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2006-12-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061227

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-10-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061025

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-24 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

2006-02-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051110

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60018004 P 20050317

2005-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031104

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011011

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI