Global Patent Index - EP 1091362 A2

EP 1091362 A2 2001-04-11 - Data transmission cable and method of manufacture

Title (en)

Data transmission cable and method of manufacture

Title (de)

Datenübertragungskabel und Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Câble de transmission de données et méthode de fabrication

Publication

EP 1091362 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00121406 A

Priority

DE 19948678 A

Abstract (en)

The data transmission cable comprises at least one line pair (1) consisting of two parallel electrical conductors (2) and insulating covers (3) which are joined to one another to form a single component extruded onto the conductors. Also claimed is a method for producing such line pairs. It involves extrusion of the insulating covers as a single component.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem für eine Übertragungsfrequenz von mehr als 600MHz ausgebildeten Datenübertragungskabel mit wenigstens einem Aderpaar (1) aus zwei parallel nebeneinanderliegenden Adern mit einem elektrischen Leiter (2) und einer Umhüllung (3) aus Isoliermaterial sind die Umhüllungen (3) einstückig miteinander verbunden und durch eine gemeinsame Extrusion auf ein Leiterpaar aufgebracht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 11/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091362 A2 20010411; EP 1091362 A3 20020102; DE 19948678 A1 20010503

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050118

2004-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040305

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020409

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI