Global Patent Index - EP 1091364 A2

EP 1091364 A2 2001-04-11 - Power transmission cable

Title (en)

Power transmission cable

Title (de)

Kabel zur Leistungsübertragung

Title (fr)

Câble de transmission de puissance

Publication

EP 1091364 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00440260 A

Priority

DE 19948566 A

Abstract (en)

The cable with forward and return conductors for power transmission has a coaxial structure and incorporates a layer (3) of dielectric material between the circles of individual inner forward (4a, 4b) and outer return (2) conductors.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Kabel zur Leistungsübertragung, wie Lautsprecherkabel zur Verbindung eines Lautsprechers mit einem Verstärker, mit einem Hin- und einem Rückleiter, weist das Kabel einen koaxialen Aufbau auf, wobei der aus einzelnen Leitern (4,4a,4b) bestehende Hinleiter außerhalb des Mittelpunktes des Kabels koaxial zum Mittelpunkt des Kabels angeordnet ist. Der aus einzelnen Leitern (2) bestehende Rückleiter ist im Abstand zum Hinleiter und koaxial zu diesem angeordnet. Zwischen dem Hin- und dem Rückleiter ist eine Schicht (3) aus dielektrischem Material vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 11/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 11/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 11/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091364 A2 20010411; EP 1091364 A3 20020102; DE 19948566 A1 20010419

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-29 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030904

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011124

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEXANS DEUTSCHLAND INDUSTRIES AG % CO KG.

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI