Global Patent Index - EP 1091369 A2

EP 1091369 A2 2001-04-11 - Low profile transformer and method for making a low profile transformer

Title (en)

Low profile transformer and method for making a low profile transformer

Title (de)

Niederprofiltransformator und Herstellungsverfahren eines Niederprofiltransformators

Title (fr)

Transformateur de profil bas et procédé de fabrication d'un transformateur de profil bas

Publication

EP 1091369 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00308677 A

Priority

US 41440899 A

Abstract (en)

A low profile electrical transformer (10) comprises at least two electrical windings (14) and a ferromagnetic base member (12). The base member is an integral construction presenting a core structure and a plurality of termination structures. The electrical windings are arrayed about the core structure and present a plurality of lead structures which are attached with the termination structures for electrical attachment in a circuit. A method for making the low profile transformer having an electrical winding structure including at least electrical windings and a plurality of termination structures; and a base member having a plurality of termination sites; comprises the steps of: (a) assembling the electrical winding structure and the base member; and (b) during the assembling, attaching the plurality of electrical termination structures with at least some of the plurality of termination sites to present a plurality of electrical termination loci for connection within an electrical circuit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 30/10; H01F 41/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 17/04 (2006.01); H01F 19/00 (2006.01); H01F 27/255 (2006.01); H01F 27/28 (2006.01); H01F 27/29 (2006.01); H01F 30/00 (2006.01); H01F 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/2828 (2013.01); H01F 17/04 (2013.01); H01F 27/292 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091369 A2 20010411; EP 1091369 A3 20020417; JP 2001143940 A 20010525

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021018

2003-02-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-01-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01F 30/10 A, 7H 01F 41/02 B, 7H 01F 27/29 B

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI