Global Patent Index - EP 1091375 A3

EP 1091375 A3 2002-09-18 - Multiple switch

Title (en)

Multiple switch

Title (de)

Mehrfachschalter

Title (fr)

Commutateur multiple

Publication

EP 1091375 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00121270 A

Priority

DE 29917684 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1091375A2] The multiple switch has at least two electrical switch units arranged in a row and having a common operating surface. The switch units are provided with uniform separate module housings (12), each pair of adjacent module housings being rigidly coupled together by a connecting member (14). The module housings and the connecting member are made of plastics. The module housings and the connecting member are positively interlocked may also be bonded together.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 13/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 16/02 (2006.01); H01H 9/02 (2006.01); H01H 13/04 (2006.01); H01H 13/50 (2006.01); H01H 13/70 (2006.01); H01H 19/42 (2006.01); H02B 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/503 (2013.01); H02B 1/041 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29917684 U1 20000217; BR 0004711 A 20010612; CN 1297238 A 20010530; CZ 20003710 A3 20010516; CZ 301274 B6 20091230; DE 50014603 D1 20071011; EP 1091375 A2 20010411; EP 1091375 A3 20020918; EP 1091375 B1 20070829; ES 2292394 T3 20080316; JP 2001167656 A 20010622; JP 3701559 B2 20050928; KR 20010050854 A 20010625; US 6384328 B1 20020507

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170503

2017-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50014603

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101006

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101005

2011-11-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111121

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101005

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101005

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091016

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091117

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090930

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-08-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080530

2008-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2292394 T3

2008-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-11-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071023

2007-10-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014603 P 20071011

2007-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-08-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060621

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030210

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI