Global patent index - EP 1091376 A2

EP 1091376 A2 2001-04-11 - Electric switch with pivoting knob

Title (en)

Electric switch with pivoting knob

Title (de)

Elektrischer Kipptastenschalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur électrique à touche pivotante

Publication

EP 1091376 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00120697 A

Priority

DE 19948723 A

Abstract (en)

The pushbutton switch has a button mounted in a housing (9), with an actuator (24) for acting on a switching element. The actuator is formed as a leaf spring, one end of which is fixed on the housing side, the other free end being placed against the button (10) and cooperating with the switching element. The switching element may be a microswitch (23) fixed to a circuit board arranged perpendicular to the base (41) of the housing.

Abstract (de)

Ein elektrischer Kipptastschalter (6) umfaßt eine an einem Gehäuse (9) gelagerte Taste (10), der ein Betätiger (24) zur Beaufschlagung eines Schaltelementes zugeordnet ist. Der Betätiger (24) ist als Blattfeder (40) ausgebildet, deren eines Ende gehäuseseitig festgelegt ist und deren anderes freies, mit dem Schaltelement zusammenwirkendes Ende unter Vorspannung an der Taste (10) anliegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 21/24; H01H 21/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 21/24 (2006.01); H01H 21/36 (2006.01); H01H 1/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 21/24 (2013.01); H01H 21/36 (2013.01); H01H 1/5805 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091376 A2 20010411; EP 1091376 A3 20030402; EP 1091376 B1 20041222; DE 19948723 A1 20010412

INPADOC legal status

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100531

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081002

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080915

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070914

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-09-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070920

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-09-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060908

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-01-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50009006

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-01-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-01-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031117

2004-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-10-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-07-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI