Global Patent Index - EP 1091378 A1

EP 1091378 A1 2001-04-11 - Self-blast circuit breaker with pressure relief valve and filling valve

Title (en)

Self-blast circuit breaker with pressure relief valve and filling valve

Title (de)

Selbstbeblasender Lastschalter mit Überdruckventil und Füllklappe

Title (fr)

Disjoncteur à autoexpansion à clapet de surpression et de remplissage

Publication

EP 1091378 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00410112 A

Priority

FR 9912727 A

Abstract (en)

The circuit breaker has a first assembly with a fixed contact having a fixed contact and an arc contact. A second assembly has a principle contact and moving arc contact with a breathing tube. The compression chamber (42) has a movable piston (60) opposed in motion to a valve (40) by the admission of gas from the compression chamber. A second valve (62) closes the entrance during the circuit breaking phase when the compression chamber pressure exceeds a predetermined level during the valve closed state.

Abstract (fr)

Un disjoncteur à autoexpansion et à SF6 comporte une chambre d'expansion en communication une buse se soufflage, et une chambre de compression 42 par l'intermédiaire d'un clapet 40. La chambre de compression 42 comprend un piston 60 semi-fixe agencé à l'opposé du clapet 40 pour l'admission du gaz lors de la phase d'enclenchement, et une soupape 62 servant de valve de sécurité lors de la phase de coupure, lorsque la pression à l'intérieur de la chambre de compression 42 dépasse un seuil prédéterminé dans l'état fermé du clapet 40. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/90

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/90 (2006.01); H01H 33/915 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/901 (2013.01); H01H 33/905 (2013.01); H01H 2033/888 (2013.01); H01H 2033/906 (2013.01); H01H 2033/908 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091378 A1 20010411; FR 2799571 A1 20010413; FR 2799571 B1 20011221

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060401

2004-08-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VA TECH TRANSMISSION & DISTRIBUTION SA

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE GB IT LI SE

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010903

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI