Global patent index - EP 1091444 A2

EP 1091444 A2 2001-04-11 - Planar antenna for motor-vehicles

Title (en)

Planar antenna for motor-vehicles

Title (de)

Planare Antenne für Motorfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Antenne plane pour véhicules à moteur

Publication

EP 1091444 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00121650 A

Priority

IT RE990101 A

Abstract (en)

A planar microstrip antenna is adopted for motor-car systems for both cellular telephony and other applications. In the field of cellular telephony, the antenna is utilizable in the present frequencies of 800/900 MHz (GSM, ETACS, AMPS, PCD) and the higher ones of 2.5 GHz (DCS, UMPTS, PCN, PDC 1.5); besides, it is also utilizable for applications other than telephony, such as: reception in L, DAB, GPS band and the like and at higher frequencies up to 6 GHz, also for Telepass type transponder systems and the like. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/12; H01Q 1/32; H01Q 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/12 (2006.01); H01Q 1/32 (2006.01); H01Q 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 9/0421 (2013.01); H01Q 1/1271 (2013.01); H01Q 1/3291 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0457 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091444 A2 20010411; EP 1091444 A3 20020417; EP 1091444 B1 20031217; DE 60007254 D1 20040129; DE 60007254 T2 20040930; IT 1309775 B1 20020130; IT RE990101 A1 20010409; IT RE990101 D0 19991008

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090630

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071026

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2005-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20041004

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-10-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-10-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041004

2004-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040328

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60007254

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2003-12-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-07-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASK INDUSTRIES S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-01-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020806

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI