Global Patent Index - EP 1091448 A1

EP 1091448 A1 2001-04-11 - Cap for a single terminal

Title (en)

Cap for a single terminal

Title (de)

Einzelklemmenabdeckung

Title (fr)

Couvercle pour borne unique

Publication

EP 1091448 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00117909 A

Priority

DE 19948521 A

Abstract (en)

The cover is made of electrically insulating material and has at least two side walls (2) connected by a cover base (3). The cover includes a grip. The cover may have at least one external undercut (4) arranged in the region of the side walls. The undercut may be shaped like a recessed grip. At least a section of a side wall may be ribbed or knurled.

Abstract (de)

Eine Einzelklemmenabdeckung (1) aus elektrisch isolierendem Material weist mindestens zwei Seitenwände (2) und einen die Seitenwände (2) verbindenden Abdeckboden (3) auf. Damit eine Einzelklemmenabdeckung leichter handhabbar ist, d.h. leichter abzuziehen und leichteil in verschiedenen Positionen zu halten ist, wird erfindungsgemäß vorgesehen, daß die Einzelklemmenabdeckung (1) eineGreifeinrichtung aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/223 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0817318 A1 19980107 - LEGRAND SA [FR], et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091448 A1 20010411; EP 1091448 B1 20110406; AT 504962 T 20110415; DE 19948521 A1 20010412; DE 50016089 D1 20110519; ES 2362714 T3 20110712; PL 340577 A1 20010409

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161028

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160810

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-05-03 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50016089

- Effective date: 20120110

2012-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120110

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110406

2011-07-27 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20110406

2011-07-12 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2362714 T3

- Effective date: 20110712

2011-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2011-05-19 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50016089

- Effective date: 20110519

2011-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50016089 P 20110519

2011-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2011-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES LI NL

2011-04-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: LV SI

2007-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070813

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES LI NL

2002-01-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: LV PAYMENT 20010406;SI PAYMENT 20010406

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EFEN GMBH

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010406

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES LI NL

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI