Global Patent Index - EP 1091457 A2

EP 1091457 A2 2001-04-11 - Electrical connector element and system

Title (en)

Electrical connector element and system

Title (de)

Elektrisches Steckverbindungselement und -system

Title (fr)

Elément et système de connection électrique

Publication

EP 1091457 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00120996 A

Priority

DE 19948037 A

Abstract (en)

The connector has a housing (22) into which a cable (24) having at least one core (26) is inserted. The ends (28) of the cores are stripped of insulation and serve as contact elements for direct placement against the contact elements of a complementary connector. The ends of the cores are clamped or pressed to the corresponding contact element of the complimentary connector. The housing is formed so that the contact formed when the complimentary connectors are joined together is free of sliding friction. An Independent claim is included for an electrical connector system.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein elektrisches Steckverbindungselement und ein elektrisches Steckverbindungssystem. Das Steckverbindungselement ermöglicht unter Verwendung eines komplementären Steckverbindungselements eine wiederlösbare elektrische Steckverbindung und umfaßt ein Gehäuse (22) und ein in das Gehäuse hineinführendes und von diesem gehaltenes Kabel (24) mit zumindest einer von einer Isolierung umgebenen Ader (26). Zur Kosten- und Gewichtseinsparung wird vorgeschlagen, jedes in dem Gehäuse befindliche Ende (28) der Adern abzuisolieren und diese Enden als Kontaktelemente zur unmittelbaren Anlage an zugeordnete Kontaktelemente des komplementären Steckverbindungselements zu verwenden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 24/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/02 (2006.01); H01R 13/52 (2006.01); H01R 13/11 (2006.01); H01R 13/115 (2006.01); H01R 13/405 (2006.01); H01R 13/432 (2006.01); H01R 13/627 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/5219 (2013.01); H01R 13/025 (2013.01); H01R 13/112 (2013.01); H01R 13/405 (2013.01); H01R 13/432 (2013.01); H01R 13/6271 (2013.01); Y10S 439/93 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091457 A2 20010411; EP 1091457 A3 20020508; EP 1091457 B1 20100623; DE 19948037 A1 20010517; DE 19948037 B4 20040219; DE 50015945 D1 20100805; ES 2344676 T3 20100903; US 6736682 B1 20040518

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-07-14 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50015945

- Effective date: 20110323

2011-06-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110324

2010-10-12 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2010-09-03 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2344676 T3

2010-08-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015945 P 20100805

2010-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2007-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061130

2003-01-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 24/00 A, 7H 01R 13/02 B

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI