Global Patent Index - EP 1091534 A1

EP 1091534 A1 2001-04-11 - High efficiency transmission channel

Title (en)

High efficiency transmission channel

Title (de)

Hocheffizienter Übertragungskanal

Title (fr)

Canal de transmission audio a haut rendement

Publication

EP 1091534 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402725 A

Priority

FR 9912350 A

Abstract (en)

The invention concerns an audio receiver system comprising: a modulator (1) for modulating a first digital audio signal with a first factor and a second digital audio signal with a second factor greater than the first, said second signal comprising a plurality of words having length of 1 bit over a predetermined time interval; an output device (11) comprising a loudspeaker (10) and means for transmitting the second signal to the loudspeaker (10) in analog form. The invention is characterised in that it further comprises a control device (2) connected to the modulator (1) on receiving the second signal and to the output device (11), the control device being capable of controlling the output device as from part of said predetermined time interval, the length of said part being determined on the basis of the desired volume.

Abstract (fr)

Système de réception audio comprenant : Un modulateur (1) pour moduler un premier signal audionumérique avec un premier taux en un second signal audionumérique avec un second taux supérieur au premier, ledit second signal comprenant une pluralité de mots de longueur de 1 bit sur une période prédéterminée; Un dispositif de sortie (11) comportant un haut-parleur (10) et des moyens pour transmettre le second signal, sous forme analogique, au haut-parleur (10) ; caractérisé en ce qu'il comporte en outre un dispositif de contrôle (2), connecté d'une part au modulateur (1) en recevant le second signal et d'autre part au dispositif de sortie (11), le dispositif de contrôle étant apte à contrôler le dispositif de sortie (11) à partir d'une partie de ladite période prédéterminée, la longueur de ladite partie étant déterminée en fonction du volume désiré. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 27/10; H03G 1/00; H03G 3/00; H03M 1/64; H04R 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/00 (2006.01); H03F 1/02 (2006.01); H03F 3/185 (2006.01); H03F 3/217 (2006.01); H03M 3/02 (2006.01); H04R 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091534 A1 20010411; AU 7793700 A 20010510; CN 1212045 C 20050720; CN 1344479 A 20020410; FR 2799325 A1 20010406; FR 2799325 B1 20020531; JP 2003511879 A 20030325; JP 4152105 B2 20080917; US 6597241 B1 20030722; WO 0126416 A2 20010412; WO 0126416 A3 20010830

INPADOC legal status


2011-01-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100731

2010-02-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100120

2007-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCATEL LUCENT

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011011

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI