Global Patent Index - EP 1091620 A1

EP 1091620 A1 2001-04-11 - Device for adjusting a hearing aid

Title (en)

Device for adjusting a hearing aid

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Einstellen eines Hörgerätes

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'ajustage d'une prothèse auditive

Publication

EP 1091620 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120158 A

Priority

EP 99120158 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement comprises a container module (24) which comprises a basic functionality for adjusting all hearing aids of a predetermined type family, and which is or can be configured by means of a data base for adjusting the current hearing aid (10). An user interface module (26) provides an user interface for accessing adjustment functions of the container module for the current hearing aid. A data base module (28) provides configuration data, at least for the container module, according to the type of the current hearing aid. The data base module provides preferably also configuration data for the user interface module according to the type of the current hearing aid, and the user interface module displays operating elements of the user interface, according to these configuration data.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung zum Einstellen eines Hörgerätes (10) beinhaltet ein Containermodul (24), das eine Grundfunktionalität zum Einstellen aller Hörgeräte einer Typenfamilie aufweist und das datenbankgestützt zum Einstellen des aktuellen Hörgeräts (10) konfigurierbar oder konfiguriert ist, ein Benutzerschnittstellenmodul (26) zum Bereitstellen einer Benutzeroberfläche, und ein Datenbankmodul (28) zum Bereitstellen von Konfigurationsdaten. Die Erfindung ist zum flexiblen Einstellen unterschiedlicher Hörgerätetypen der Typenfamilie vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 25/00; G06F 9/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/70 (2013.01); H04R 25/556 (2013.01); H04R 25/558 (2013.01); H04R 25/505 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091620 A1 20010411

INPADOC legal status


2008-06-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20071129

2007-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070718

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE DK FR LI NL

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010507

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR LI NL

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI