Global Patent Index - EP 1091623 A2

EP 1091623 A2 2001-04-11 - Heating conductor with raccording element and/or closing element and its manufacturing process

Title (en)

Heating conductor with raccording element and/or closing element and its manufacturing process

Title (de)

Heizleiter mit einem Anschlusselement und/oder einem Abschlusselement sowie ein Verfahren zur Herstellung desselben

Title (fr)

Conducteur chauffant muni d'un élément de raccord et/ou d'un élément de fermeture ainsi que son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1091623 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00121536 A

Priority

DE 19948819 A

Abstract (en)

Heat conductor comprises a connecting element (1A,1B) and a heating element (2) having a heating strip (3) and heating strip cords (4,5) and surrounded by a fluoropolymer protective layer (6). A further fluoropolymer plastic material is applied in the region of the connecting elements. An Independent claim is also included for a process for the production of a connecting element for a heat conductor comprising cutting a heating strip with heating strip cords in a prescribed region for the connecting elements and exposing the cords; applying a fluoropolymer plastic layer to the strip; applying a screen covering (8) to the plastic layer; back-cutting the covering layer in the region of the connecting elements; connecting one end of a extension line (9) to the connection point (8A,8B); applying an outer protective casing made of a fluoropolymer plastic to the heat conductor and the hot conductor connections; and finishing the connecting element regions by connecting lines to the cords and/or providing the lines with contact elements.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Heizleiter, im wesentlichen bestehend aus mindestens einem Heizelement, welches ein Heizband und Heizleitungen aufweist und von einer Fluorpolymer-Schutzschicht ummantelt ist, besteht das Erfordernis, diesen Heizleiter mit einem Anschlußelement und/oder einem Abschlußelement zu versehen, das insbesondere für den Einsatz im Bereich von Flugzeugwassersystemen geeignet ist und gegenüber den Einflußfaktoren Vibrationen, Wärmewechsel, niedrige Druckverhältnisse und Einwirkungen von Chemikalien ausreichende Dichtwirkung erzielt und ein Eindringen von Feuchtigkeit bzw. Flüssigkeiten in den Anschlußbereich des Heizleiters verhindert. Gesundheitsgefährende Mittel zum Herstellen eines Abschluß- bzw. Anschlußelementes sind dabei zu vermeiden. Es wird erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, daß im Bereich der Anschluß- bzw. Abschlußelemente zur Abdichtung ein Fluorpolymer-Kunststoffmaterial aufgebracht ist. Verfahren zur Herstellung eines solchen Anschluß- bzw. Abschlußelementes am Heizleiter sind ebenfalls angegeben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/04; H05B 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/20 (2006.01); H05B 3/02 (2006.01); H05B 3/06 (2006.01); H05B 3/10 (2006.01); H05B 3/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/56 (2013.01); H05B 3/06 (2013.01); H05B 3/565 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1091623 A2 20010411; EP 1091623 A3 20020529; EP 1091623 B1 20050907; AT 304277 T 20050915; DE 19948819 A1 20010523; DE 19948819 C2 20020124; DE 50011103 D1 20051013; ES 2248000 T3 20060316; JP 2001160478 A 20010612; US 6423952 B1 20020723

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-12-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: AIRBUS OPERATIONS GMBH

- Effective date: 20111118

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2008-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: AIRBUS DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050930

2006-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20051001

2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060608

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-05-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-05-03 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2248000 T3

2006-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-02-07 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060207

2006-01-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051215

2005-12-07 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051207

2005-12-07 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051207

2005-12-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051207

2005-11-07 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051107

2005-10-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011103 P 20051013

2005-10-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-10-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-09-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-09-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-09-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-09-07 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050907

2005-09-07 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050907

2005-09-07 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050907

2003-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030908

2003-02-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020613

2002-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 05B 3/04 A, 7H 05B 3/06 B, 7C 08L 27/12 B, 7H 01R 4/70 B, 7H 05B 3/56 B

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIRBUS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI