Global Patent Index - EP 1091667 A1

EP 1091667 A1 2001-04-18 - LIGHTING MODULAR PANEL FOR MODULAR KITCHEN FURNITURE

Title (en)

LIGHTING MODULAR PANEL FOR MODULAR KITCHEN FURNITURE

Title (de)

MODULARE BELEUCHTUNGSPLATTE FÜR MODULARE KÜCHENMÖBEL

Title (fr)

PANNEAUX D'ECLAIRAGE MODULAIRES POUR MOBILIER DE CUISINE MODULAIRE

Publication

EP 1091667 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00922854 A

Priority

  • IT 0000141 W
  • IT AN990019 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0062646A1] The present invention relates to a modular panel for wall fixing, capable of being assembled in a sequence and electrically connected with other manufactures of the same type, in order to decorate and light kitchen areas, especially in the space comprised between the wall cabinets and the counters of modular kitchen furniture.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 77/00; A47B 97/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 77/02 (2006.01); A47B 77/00 (2006.01); A47B 97/00 (2006.01); F21S 2/00 (2006.01); F21V 23/06 (2006.01); F21V 33/00 (2006.01); F21W 131/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 77/00 (2013.01); A47B 97/00 (2013.01); F21V 23/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0062646A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0062646 A1 20001026; AU 4312500 A 20001102; CN 1300196 A 20010620; DE 60003621 D1 20030807; DE 60003621 T2 20040609; EP 1091667 A1 20010418; EP 1091667 B1 20030702; IT 1309519 B1 20020123; IT AN990019 A1 20001016; IT AN990019 D0 19990415; JP 2002542578 A 20021210

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-04-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050412

2005-01-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2004-07-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-06-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040405

2004-06-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040623

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-10-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031013

2003-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60003621

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-08-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT NL

2003-07-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030702

2003-07-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030702

2003-07-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030702

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001206

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE