Global Patent Index - EP 1091668 A1

EP 1091668 A1 2001-04-18 - TELESCOPIC GUIDE WITH SUSPENSION BRACKET

Title (en)

TELESCOPIC GUIDE WITH SUSPENSION BRACKET

Title (de)

TELESKOPFÜHRUNG MIT HALTEBÜGEL

Title (fr)

GUIDE TELESCOPIQUE MUNI D'UNE FERRURE DE SUSPENSION

Publication

EP 1091668 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99931587 A

Priority

  • NL 9900415 W
  • NL 1009545 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0001278A1] A guide, comprising at least a cabinet section and a drawer section slidable with respect thereto in a longitudinal direction, wherein, during use, at least one suspension bracket is connected with a wall part of the cabinet section, wherein the cabinet section comprises first mounting means and the or each suspension bracket comprises second mounting means, wherein at least one of the mounting means comprises a wall part provided with at least one attachment projection with a clamping part located at a distance from the wall part, and the other mounting means are provided with fixing means for cooperation with the at least one attachment projection, the arrangement being such that by at least partly sliding in the fixing means between the at least one attachment projection and the relevant wall part the mounting means can be interconnected so as to be at least substantially fixed in position and supporting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/43 (2017.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0001278 A1 20000113; AU 4803899 A 20000124; DE 69934118 D1 20070104; DE 69934118 T2 20071011; EP 1091668 A1 20010418; EP 1091668 B1 20061122; JP 2002519127 A 20020702; NL 1009545 C2 20000107

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140702

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-05-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69934118

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140702

2015-04-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150331

2015-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150201

2015-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140702

2015-02-25 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20150201

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69934118

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130729

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130722

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130722

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130716

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070823

2007-05-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69934118

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-01-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2006-11-22 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DAX

2006-11-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-07-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-11-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: TELESCOPIC GUIDE FOR CABINETS AND SUSPENSION BRACKET THEREFOR

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001123

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI