Global patent index - EP 1091726 A2

EP 1091726 A2 2001-04-18 - ANALOGS OF 2-PHTHALIMIDINOGLUTARIC ACID AND THEIR USE AS INHIBITORS OF ANGIOGENESIS

Title (en)

ANALOGS OF 2-PHTHALIMIDINOGLUTARIC ACID AND THEIR USE AS INHIBITORS OF ANGIOGENESIS

Title (de)

ANALOGE DER 2-PHTHALIMIDINOGLUTARSÄURE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS INHIBITOREN DER ANGIOGENESE

Title (fr)

ANALOGUES DE L'ACIDE 2-PHTHALIMIDINOGLUTARIQUE

Publication

EP 1091726 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99925585 A

Priority

  • US 9910287 W
  • US 8503798 P
  • US 9738498 P
  • US 10803798 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9958096A2] The invention provides new and useful analogs of 2-phthalimidinoglutaric acid. These analogs include DL-2- methyl-2- phthalimidinoglutaric acid and hydroxylated analogs of 2-phthalimidinoglutaric. The invention also provides processes for making these analogs. The invention also provides the two individual enantiomers of DL-2- methyl-2- phthalimidinoglutaric acid, (R)-(+)-2- methyl-2- phthalimidinoglutaric acid and (S)-(-)-2-methyl-2-phthalimidinoglutaric acid, and processes for separating these individual enantiomers from the racemate. Further, the invention provides methods for inhibiting angiogenesis and treating angiogenesis-associated diseases, including cancer and macular degeneration, by administering one or more of these compounds.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/4035 (2006.01); A61K 31/403 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/06 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01); A61P 27/06 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/22 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/02 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 209/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 209/46 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9958096A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9958096 A2 19991118; WO 9958096 A3 20000518; WO 9958096 A9 20000713; AU 4183799 A 19991129; AU 749356 B2 20020627; CA 2331461 A1 19991118; CA 2331461 C 20081007; EP 1091726 A2 20010418; JP 2002514578 A 20020521

INPADOC legal status

2012-05-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20111201

2005-01-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SHAH, JAMSHED, H.

2005-01-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SWARTZ, GLENN, M.

2005-01-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PAPATHANASSIU, ADONIA E.

2005-01-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FOGLER, WILLIAM, E.

2005-01-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MADSEN, JOHN, W.

2005-01-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GREEN, SHAWN, J.

2005-01-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: D'AMATO, ROBERT, J.

2004-12-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE CHILDREN'S MEDICAL CENTER CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031110

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001215

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE