Global Patent Index - EP 1091739 A1

EP 1091739 A1 2001-04-18 - METHOD FOR INHIBITING C-JUN EXPRESSION USING JAK-3 INHIBITORS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR INHIBITING C-JUN EXPRESSION USING JAK-3 INHIBITORS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HEMMEN DER C-JUN EXPRESSION MITTELS VERWENDUNG VON JAK-3 HEMMERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR INHIBER L'EXPRESSION DE C-JUN EN UTILISANT LES INHIBITEURS DE JAK-3

Publication

EP 1091739 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99932145 A

Priority

  • US 9914923 W
  • US 9115098 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0000202A1] The invention provides the use of a compound that inhibits the activity of Janus family kinase 3 (JAK-3), or pharmaceutically acceptable salt thereof; for the manufacture of a medicament for inhibiting c-jun activation in mammalian or avian cells.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/517; C07D 243/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/01 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/517 (2006.01); A61K 38/55 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 239/86 (2006.01); C07D 239/94 (2006.01); C07D 243/34 (2006.01); C12N 9/99 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 239/94 (2013.01); A61K 31/00 (2013.01); A61K 31/517 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000202A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0000202 A1 20000106; AU 4851599 A 20000117; CA 2337999 A1 20000106; EP 1091739 A1 20010418; JP 2004504259 A 20040212

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-01 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1035499

2006-04-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051011

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030513

2002-05-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PARKER HUGHES INSTITUTE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010129

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE