Global patent index - EP 1091812 A1

EP 1091812 A1 2001-04-18 - METHOD FOR CLEANING AN OIL STORAGE TANK AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING SAME

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CLEANING AN OIL STORAGE TANK AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING SAME

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM REINIGEN EINES ÖLSPEICHERTANKS UND GERÄT ZUR VERWIRKLICHUNG DES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE NETTOYAGE D'UNE CUVE DE PETROLE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DUDIT PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1091812 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 97952101 A

Priority

  • FR 9702347 W
  • LU 90183 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EA003659B1] 1. A process for recovering in suspension of sludge (3), which is formed, as a result of sedimentation, layer over the bottom of a storage tank (1), with floating cover (2), provided with a quantity of leg openings (4), uniformly distributed on the surface and allowing to fix the legs, able to support the cover (2), leaning on the bottom of the storage tank (Ib), when the level of crude oil in storage tank (1) become lower than the length (D) of legs, wherein: the level of crude oil in storage tank (1) is taken to distance L from highest level of sludge (3) on the bottom of storage tank (Ib), crude oil is pumped from the storage tank (1) with, at least, one pump (8) with the global production per hour which is equal to V/n, wherein V is volume, placed in storage tank (1) under the floating cover (2), the pumped crude oil is reintroduced in storage tank (1), supercharging by means of nozzles (5), installed in floating cover (2) instead of legs in leg sleeves and introduced in storage tank (1) vertically above the sludge (3), wherein each of mentioned nozzles (5) has under the floating cover a length less than L and being driven in axial rotation, wherein the lower tip is blanked off and provided with, at least, one jet over the sludge (3), stream (8a) being directed to the side of storage tank bottom (1b), and outflow face of jet or jets of the same nozzle (5) is quite small for the outflow pressure of stream of crude oil together with consumption making by one pump to ensure to creation turbulent volume around the nozzle (5), the procedure is going until the density of pumpable crude oil is equal to predefined value, which corresponds to almost full recovering of sludge (3) in suspension state, distance L being between 2 and 5 meters, n between 8 and 15, and nozzles are driven in rotation with speed of from 0.25 to 4 rpm. 2. Process according to claim 1, characterized in that the jet or jets of lower level of each nozzle (5) are placed on from 20 to 50 sm upper from the average sludge level (3). 3. Process according to claim 1 or 2, characterized in that on each nozzle (5) there are a lot of jets, distributed along the nozzle for the turbulent volume, formed by one nozzle (5) to cover a whole layer thickness of crude oil in storage tank (1). 4. A device for recovering in suspension of sludge (3), which is formed, as a result of sedimentation on the bottom of storage tank (1), with floating cover (2), closing crude oil, containing nozzles (5), with possibility of installing in a floating cover (2) instead of legs in leg sleeves and with introduction in storage tank (1) vertically above the sludge (3), wherein each of mentioned nozzles (5) are installed with the possibility of axial rotation and provided with several jets, placed on three levels in relation to the bottom of storage tank (Ib), the jet of middle level forming the stream, almost horizontal, the jets of lower level are directed to the bottom of tank, and jets of upper level are directed to the floating cover (2), wherein the lets of upper and lower level form streams, the legs being inclined to 50 degree -70 degree relative to legs of nozzle (5), bringing the jets. 5. Device according to claim 4, characterized in that each level of jets contains 2 diametrically opposite jets. 6. Device according to claim 4 or 5, characterized in that the pump or pumps (8), pumping crude oil from the tank are volume pumps. 7. Device according to claim 6, characterized in that it contains at least 2 pumps (8), before each at least one filter (9) is installed, and with following (12) behind each one, feeding p jets (5), wherein p is equal integer for all capacities of device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 9/093

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/093 (2006.01); B08B 9/08 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

B08B (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/0933 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9932238A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

LU 90183 A1 19980406; AT 370801 T 20070915; AU 5564598 A 19990712; BR 9714913 A 20020507; DE 69738052 D1 20071004; DE 69738052 T2 20080515; DK 1091812 T3 20080128; EA 003659 B1 20030828; EP 1091812 A1 20010418; EP 1091812 B1 20070822; ES 2293666 T3 20080316; HK 1035509 A1 20040702; NO 20003169 A 20000811; NO 20003169 D0 20000619; NO 322452 B1 20061009; PT 1091812 E 20071203; PT 975148 E 20070228; UA 68367 C2 20001215; WO 9932238 A1 19990701

INPADOC legal status

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091219

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110314

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091219

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091218

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091218

2011-03-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110328

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100104

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091218

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091218

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091218

2010-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091218

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20091218

2010-08-09 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2010-07-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-07-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100618

2010-07-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-07-27 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2010-07-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: PETROJET INTERNATIONAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-06-28 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100618

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081224

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-09-30 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090112

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090114

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081224

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081231

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081229

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090131

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090109

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090113

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090119

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090115

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090114

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081224

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080526

2008-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2293666

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2008-01-28 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2008-01-16 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20070403487

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2007-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ABREMA AGENCE BREVET ET MARQUES, GANGUILLET

2007-12-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20071128

2007-12-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2007-12-03 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20071119

2007-10-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69738052

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-10-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-09-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2007-09-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2007-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-08-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040219

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000623

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE